House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |