House | 02/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |