House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Re-assigned to Housing | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chris Miller |