House | 03/11/2024 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |