House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0015
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date July 1, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|