House | 04/26/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |