House | 06/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese | ||
House | 06/24/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |