House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0518
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 063-041-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 035-020-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-040-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|