House
|
11/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicolle Grasse
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner; Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|