Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-018-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|