House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0281
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024; ; Some Provisions
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023; ; Some Provisions
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 House Concurs 074-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 074-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 011-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 011-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 050-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-013-004
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 016-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|