House
|
06/29/2024
|
Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Re-assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|