House | 03/27/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Friess | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 014-000-000 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |