House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|