House | 04/20/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |