House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0019
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-033-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Public Utilities Committee; 013-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 014-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|