House | 01/16/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |