House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Pension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Pension Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Fiscal Note Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|