House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |