House | 06/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 06/24/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William E Hauter |