House | 03/27/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Friess | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |