House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0521
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|