House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0022
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date August 8, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 036-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Human Rights; 005-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Human Rights
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Immigration & Human Rights Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|