House
|
05/28/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-010-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|