House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0023
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|