Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session

Illinois House Bill HB1639 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2023

                            103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB1639 Introduced , by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new  Amends the Counties Code. Creates the Coroner Standards and Reorganization Task Force. Provides for the appointment of 9 members to the Task Force. Includes provisions relating to Task Force membership, meetings, duties to evaluate different aspects concerning coroners in Illinois, and reports to the Governor and General Assembly. Provides that the Coroner Training Board shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force is dissolved on January 1, 2025. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2026. Effective immediately.  LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b   A BILL FOR 103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB1639 Introduced , by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:  55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new 55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new  Amends the Counties Code. Creates the Coroner Standards and Reorganization Task Force. Provides for the appointment of 9 members to the Task Force. Includes provisions relating to Task Force membership, meetings, duties to evaluate different aspects concerning coroners in Illinois, and reports to the Governor and General Assembly. Provides that the Coroner Training Board shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force is dissolved on January 1, 2025. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2026. Effective immediately.  LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b     LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b   A BILL FOR
103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB1639 Introduced , by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new 55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new
55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new
Amends the Counties Code. Creates the Coroner Standards and Reorganization Task Force. Provides for the appointment of 9 members to the Task Force. Includes provisions relating to Task Force membership, meetings, duties to evaluate different aspects concerning coroners in Illinois, and reports to the Governor and General Assembly. Provides that the Coroner Training Board shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force is dissolved on January 1, 2025. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2026. Effective immediately.
LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b     LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
    LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
A BILL FOR
HB1639LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b   HB1639  LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
  HB1639  LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
1  AN ACT concerning local government.
2  Be it enacted by the People of the State of Illinois,
3  represented in the General Assembly:
4  Section 5. The Counties Code is amended by adding Section
5  3-3046 as follows:
6  (55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new)
7  Sec. 3-3046. Coroner Standards and Reorganization Task
8  Force
9  (a) The Coroner Standards and Reorganization Task Force is
10  created. The Task Force shall consist of the following
11  members:
12  (1) one member appointed by the Speaker of the House
13  of Representatives, one member appointed by the Minority
14  Leader of the House of Representatives, one member
15  appointed by the President of the Senate, and one member
16  appointed by the Minority Leader of the Senate;
17  (2) three members appointed by the Governor, two of
18  whom are either an elected coroner within the State at the
19  time of appointment or a former elected coroner within the
20  State;
21  (3) the Secretary of State or the Secretary's
22  designee; and
23  (4) the Director of the Department of Public Health or

 

103RD GENERAL ASSEMBLY State of Illinois 2023 and 2024 HB1639 Introduced , by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth SYNOPSIS AS INTRODUCED:
55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new 55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new
55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new
Amends the Counties Code. Creates the Coroner Standards and Reorganization Task Force. Provides for the appointment of 9 members to the Task Force. Includes provisions relating to Task Force membership, meetings, duties to evaluate different aspects concerning coroners in Illinois, and reports to the Governor and General Assembly. Provides that the Coroner Training Board shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force is dissolved on January 1, 2025. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2026. Effective immediately.
LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b     LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
    LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
A BILL FOR

 

 

55 ILCS 5/3-3046 new



    LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b

 

 



 

  HB1639  LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b


HB1639- 2 -LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b   HB1639 - 2 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
  HB1639 - 2 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
1  the Director's designee.
2  Initial appointments to the Task Force shall be made not
3  more than 3 months after the effective date of this amendatory
4  Act of the 103rd General Assembly. If a vacancy occurs in the
5  Task Force membership, the vacancy shall be filled in the same
6  manner as the original appointment until the Task Force is
7  dissolved. Task force members shall serve without
8  compensation.
9  (b) The Task Force shall hold its first meeting within one
10  month after its members have been appointed and shall convene
11  as the Task Force deems appropriate to carry out its duties and
12  submit the reports required under this Section. At its first
13  meeting, the Task Force shall elect its chairperson and any
14  other officers from among its members.
15  (c) The Task Force should evaluate the following in
16  consultation with the Coroner Training Board:
17  (1) whether professional experience and medical
18  competency requirements for elected coroners are feasible
19  and, if so, how those requirements ought to be
20  implemented;
21  (2) whether the regionalization of coroner offices in
22  the State or portions of the State is feasible and, if so,
23  how the regionalization of those offices ought to be
24  implemented;
25  (3) whether the current distribution of resources and
26  funding made available to coroners throughout the State is

 

 

  HB1639 - 2 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b


HB1639- 3 -LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b   HB1639 - 3 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
  HB1639 - 3 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
1  adequate;
2  (4) whether there ought to be ethics requirements for
3  coroners, including, but not limited to, ethical
4  requirements concerning conflicts of interest arising from
5  coroners who serve as coroners and operate funeral homes;
6  (5) whether best practices concerning death
7  investigation should be implemented;
8  (6) whether the current law regarding autopsies is
9  effective and complied with;
10  (7) whether best practices concerning organ and tissue
11  donation referrals ought to be implemented; and
12  (8) whether the coroner training program implemented
13  under the Coroner Training Board Act is effective when
14  compared with best practices for coroner training and
15  continuing education employed in other states.
16  (d) The Task Force shall submit an initial report to the
17  Governor and the General Assembly not later than 12 months
18  after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 103rd
19  General Assembly. The report shall include the Task Force's
20  findings and shall summarize the actions the Task Force has
21  taken and those it intends to take in response to its
22  obligations under this Section. After it submits its initial
23  report, the Task Force shall submit a final report to the
24  Governor and the General Assembly between July 1, 2024 and
25  December 1, 2024 to apprise the Governor and the General
26  Assembly of any additional findings made or actions taken by

 

 

  HB1639 - 3 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b


HB1639- 4 -LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b   HB1639 - 4 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
  HB1639 - 4 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b
1  the Task Force.
2  (e) The Coroner Training Board shall provide
3  administrative and other support to the Task Force.
4  (f) The Task Force is dissolved on January 1, 2025.
5  (g) This Section is repealed on January 1, 2026.
6  Section 99. Effective date. This Act takes effect upon
7  becoming law.

 

 

  HB1639 - 4 - LRB103 05228 AWJ 50246 b