House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |