House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |