House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 To Teacher Policy & Research Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|