House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |