House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |