House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|