House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0423
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 088-025-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 088-025-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-018-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 005-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 005-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-027-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|