House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|