House
|
10/30/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-006-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|