House | 10/04/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |