Senate | 03/21/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-039-000 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-005-000 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |