House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0425
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 House Concurs 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3, 4, 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|