House
|
06/09/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0025
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|