House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |