House
|
08/15/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0524
|
|
|
House
|
08/15/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 075-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Environment and Conservation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|