House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|