House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0426
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 068-034-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|