Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|