House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0292
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|