House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |