House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0427
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|