House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |