House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |