House
|
12/08/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0567
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Effective Date December 8, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
3/5 Vote Required
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|